Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo de Ferrari, C.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1885Born
8 Aug 190923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
16 Dec 193550.2AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
12 Jan 193650.2Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
12 Apr 194155.5AppointedArchbishop of Trento, Italy
14 Dec 196277.1DiedArchbishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo de Ferrari
Archbishop Carlo de Ferrari C.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontechiaro di Val Venosta

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018