Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Sebastião Francisco Fernandes

Deceased

Bishop of Mysore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1917BornSt. Matias Ilhas
26 Oct 194427.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 196346.0AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
3 Feb 196446.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
9 May 198567.5DiedBishop of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Mathias Sebastião Francisco Fernandes:
Bishop Mathias Sebastião Francisco Fernandes (born , died ) Bishop of Mysore

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013