Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulino Fernandes Madeca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cabinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1927BornPovo Grande
20 Jul 195830.6Ordained PriestPriest of Luanda, Angola
22 Jul 198355.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
22 Jul 198355.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Egnatia
9 Oct 198355.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egnatia
2 Jul 198456.6AppointedBishop of Cabinda, Angola
11 Feb 200577.2RetiredBishop of Cabinda, Angola
9 Jan 200880.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cabinda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Paulino Fernandes Madeca:
Bishop Paulino Fernandes Madeca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cabinda

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013