Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Fenizia

Deceased

Bishop of Cava e Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1889BornNapoli
15 Aug 191425.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 193849.1AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
30 Oct 193849.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
21 Jul 194859.0AppointedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
15 Nov 195263.3DiedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Fenizia:
Bishop Gennaro Fenizia (born , died ) Bishop of Cava e Sarno

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1938, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013