Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Fabiani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1926Born
20 May 195023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bertinoro, Italy
19 Jul 198962.6AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
10 Sep 198962.7Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
23 Sep 198962.8InstalledBishop of Imola, Italy
18 Oct 200275.8RetiredBishop of Imola, Italy
25 Jun 201992.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Fabiani
Bishop Giuseppe Fabiani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBertinoro, Diocese of Bertinoro
Ordained PriestCathedral, Bertinoro, Diocese of Bertinoro
Ordained BishopSan Tommaso Cantuariense, Cathedral, Forli, Diocese of Forli-Bertinoro
Death PlaceCasa di Cura del Toniolo, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, San Cassiano, Cathedral, Imola, Diocese of Imola

  • a priest for 69.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,668
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 Jun 2019
  • loc/c1: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast