Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Louis Alexandre Expilly] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Finistère (Constitutional), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1742Born
31 Oct 179048.6SelectedBishop of Finistère (Constitutional), France
24 Feb 179149.0Ordained BishopBishop of Finistère (Constitutional), France
22 May 179452.2DiedBishop of Finistère (Constitutional), France

MicroData Summary for Louis Alexandre Expilly
Bishop Louis Alexandre Expilly (born , died ) Bishop of Finistère

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFinistère
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 6 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast