Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Ludger Dupré

Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1933 BornSouth Hadley Falls
23 May 195925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
7 Apr 199056.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
7 Apr 199056.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hodelm
31 May 199056.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hodelm
14 Mar 199561.3AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
11 Feb 200470.2ResignedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ludger Dupré:
Bishop Thomas Ludger Dupré (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015