Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pedro da Silva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viseu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1917BornSanto Antão
24 Apr 194326.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 195639.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
30 Jul 195639.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiava
18 Nov 195639.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thiava
25 Nov 196144.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Goa e Damão, India
13 Feb 196547.9AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
14 Sep 198871.4ResignedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
23 May 200083.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José Pedro da Silva:
Bishop José Pedro da Silva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viseu

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 105
  • ob/ab/goae: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013