Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert William Donnelly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toledo, Ohio

Titular Bishop of Garba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1931BornToledo
25 May 195726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Ohio, USA
14 Mar 198453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Ohio, USA
14 Mar 198453.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Garba
3 May 198453.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garba
30 May 200675.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Ohio, USA
21 Jul 201483.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toledo, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert William Donnelly:
Bishop Robert William Donnelly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toledo

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Vatican Information Service
  • d: CB, 21 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014