Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesario D’Amato, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1904BornNapoli
25 Jul 192823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Nov 195551.2AppointedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
7 Nov 195551.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
27 Nov 195551.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
14 Feb 196459.5ResignedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
23 Aug 200096.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesario D’Amato:
Bishop Cesario D’Amato O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura

  • a priest for 72.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 107
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013