Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Dalla Valle, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Juína, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1945BornCrespano del Grappa
26 Aug 197227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Dec 199752.4AppointedBishop of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil
6 Jan 199852.4Ordained BishopBishop of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil
2 Aug 200762.0DiedBishop of Juína, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Franco Dalla Valle:
Bishop Franco Dalla Valle S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Juína

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,186
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013