Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Cuttitta

Bishop of Ragusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1962 Born
10 Jan 198724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
28 May 200745.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
28 May 200745.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Novi
7 Jul 200745.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novi
7 Oct 201553.5AppointedBishop of Ragusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Cuttitta
Bishop Carmelo Cuttitta (born ) Bishop of Ragusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGodrano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ragusa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,478
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast