Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prospero Curti

Deceased

Bishop of Guastalla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1825BornSan Polo d'Enza
23 Feb 185024.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 185024.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 188459.1AppointedBishop of Guastalla, Italy
16 Nov 188459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guastalla, Italy
21 Mar 189064.4DiedBishop of Guastalla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Prospero Curti:
Bishop Prospero Curti (born , died ) Bishop of Guastalla

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013