Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Belmiro Cuica Chissengueti, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Cabinda, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1969 Born
5 Aug 199526.4Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
5 May 199627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
3 Jul 201849.3AppointedBishop of Cabinda, Angola
30 Sep 201849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cabinda, Angola
7 Oct 201849.5InstalledBishop of Cabinda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Belmiro Cuica Chissengueti
Bishop Belmiro Cuica Chissengueti C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Cabinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBié
Ordained BishopEstadio dos Coqueiros, Luanda, Archdiocese of Luanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cabinda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 15 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 26 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast