Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Cristau Coll

Auxiliary Bishop of Terrassa

Titular Bishop of Aliezira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1950 BornBarcelona
12 Oct 198030.5Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
14 Jan 198534.7IncardinatedPriest of Barcelona, Spain
15 Jun 200454.2IncardinatedPriest of Terrassa, Spain
18 May 201060.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Terrassa, Spain
18 May 201060.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aliezira
26 Jun 201060.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aliezira

MicroData Summary for Salvador Cristau Coll:
Bishop Salvador Cristau Coll (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Terrassa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Terrassa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013