Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Marie-Félix Courtois, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kayes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1913BornSainte-Foy-lès-Lyon, France
11 Jun 193824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
7 Nov 194734.1AppointedPrefect of Kayes, Mali
6 Jul 196349.8AppointedBishop of Kayes, Mali
20 Oct 196350.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kayes, Mali
11 Jul 197864.8DiedBishop of Kayes, Mali

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Marie-Félix Courtois:
Bishop Etienne-Marie-Félix Courtois M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop of Kayes

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013