Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-Maurice Clément

Deceased

Bishop of Monaco

Titular Bishop of Algiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1865BornEnghien-les-Bains, France
8 Jul 189429.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
25 Apr 192458.8AppointedBishop of Monaco
2 Jul 192459.0Ordained BishopBishop of Monaco
19 Oct 192459.3InstalledBishop of Monaco
2 Mar 193670.7ResignedBishop of Monaco
2 Mar 193670.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Algiza
3 Mar 193973.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Maurice Clément:
Bishop Auguste-Maurice Clément (born , died ) Bishop of Monaco

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013