Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Loy Chong

Archbishop of Suva, Fiji


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1961 BornNatovi, Tailevu
11 Jan 199230.9Ordained PriestPriest of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
19 Dec 201251.8AppointedArchbishop of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
8 Jun 201352.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Suva, Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Peter Loy Chong:
Archbishop Peter Loy Chong (born ) Archbishop of Suva

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Suva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2012
  • c2+: CB, 3 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,799

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015