Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Cherubin

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1838Born
23 Sep 186527.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 189960.7AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
20 Aug 189960.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
3 Jul 191071.8DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cherubin (VIAF: 88663723)
Bishop Francesco Cherubin (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSt Marc, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017