Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Joseph Carroll, S.M.A.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kontagora

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1940 BornMillstreet, Ireland
20 Dec 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
15 Dec 199555.6AppointedPrefect of Kontagora, Nigeria
30 Apr 200262.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
30 Apr 200262.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kontagora, Nigeria
17 Aug 200262.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
30 Apr 201070.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kontagora, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Timothy Joseph Carroll:
Bishop Timothy Joseph Carroll S.M.A. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kontagora

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Kontagora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013