Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rodolfo Caroli

Deceased

Apostolic Internuncio to Bolivia

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1869BornRoma
1 Apr 189323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
28 Jul 191343.6AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
19 Oct 191343.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
28 Apr 191747.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Bolivia
8 May 191747.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
25 Jan 192151.1DiedApostolic Internuncio to Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Caroli:
Archbishop Rodolfo Caroli (born , died ) Apostolic Internuncio of Bolivia

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013