Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Peri-Morosini

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lugano

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1862BornLugano
15 Aug 188523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
15 Apr 190442.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland
15 Apr 190442.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
17 Apr 190442.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
29 Dec 191654.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland
27 Jul 193169.4DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Peri-Morosini:
Bishop Alfredo Peri-Morosini (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lugano

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 17
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013