Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Canales Motiño

Bishop of Danlí, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1962 Born
12 Oct 199634.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
2 Jan 201754.7AppointedBishop of Danlí, Honduras
11 Mar 201754.9Ordained BishopBishop of Danlí, Honduras

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Canales Motiño
Bishop José Antonio Canales Motiño (born ) Bishop of Danlí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Lima, Vicariate Apostolic of San Pedro Sula
Ordained BishopDanlí, Diocese of Danlí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Danlí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 4 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 17 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017