Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Camacho y Rojas

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703¹BornTunja
13 Apr 175350.2SelectedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
28 May 175350.4ConfirmedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
24 Jun 175451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
18 Aug 175451.6DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Camacho y Rojas:
Bishop Ferdinand Camacho y Rojas (born 1703, died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015