Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto (Patrick) Camilleri Azzopardi, O.F.M.

Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1951 Born
20 Oct 196716.4EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
1 Nov 196817.5Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Dec 197221.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 197524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jul 200150.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
26 Jul 200150.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagada
15 Aug 200150.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagada
21 May 200453.0AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
24 Jul 200453.2InstalledBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Roberto (Patrick) Camilleri Azzopardi
Bishop Roberto (Patrick) Camilleri Azzopardi O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamrun, Archdiocese of Malta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Comayagua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast