Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Brück (Brueck)

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1831Born
30 Mar 185523.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 189968.1SelectedBishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Mar 190068.4ConfirmedBishop of Mainz, Germany
20 May 190068.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Nov 190372.0DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Brück (Brueck)
Bishop Heinrich Brück (Brueck) (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBingen

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018