Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Marie Raoul Brincard, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1939BornSavennières
23 Aug 197535.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
8 Aug 198848.7AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
2 Oct 198848.8Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
14 Nov 201474.9DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Marie Raoul Brincard:
Bishop Henri Marie Raoul Brincard C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,817
  • d: CB, 14 Nov 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015