Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franco Brambilla

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Australia

Titular Archbishop of Viminacium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1923Born
29 Aug 194723.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 197047.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Viminacium
24 Dec 197047.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Tanzania
14 Feb 197147.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Viminacium
21 Nov 198157.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
22 Feb 198662.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Australia
3 Dec 199875.0RetiredApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Australia
28 Jul 200379.6DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Australia

MicroData Summary for Franco Brambilla
Archbishop Franco Brambilla (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Australia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrugherio, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 666

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast