Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Gil Zorrilla, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1930BornMontevideo
19 Dec 196434.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Jan 198352.5AppointedBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
10 Apr 198352.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
22 Apr 198352.8InstalledBishop of Tacuarembó, Uruguay
8 Mar 198958.7AppointedBishop of Salto, Uruguay
16 May 200675.8RetiredBishop of Salto, Uruguay
7 Sep 200878.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Salto, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Daniel Gil Zorrilla:
Bishop Daniel Gil Zorrilla S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salto

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2006
  • d: CB
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 7,091
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013