Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bockwinckel (Bockwinkel), S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Encarnación, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1910Born
1934²23.3ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
17 Sep 193828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
11 May 196857.7AppointedPrelate of Encarnación, Paraguay
11 May 196857.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Novum
23 Jun 196857.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oppidum Novum
3 Nov 197767.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Novum
24 Jul 198776.9RetiredPrelate of Encarnación, Paraguay
23 Jul 199988.9DiedPrelate Emeritus of Encarnación, Paraguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bockwinckel (Bockwinkel) (VIAF: 76396837)
Bishop Juan Bockwinckel (Bockwinkel) S.V.D. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Encarnación

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEllewich, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Encarnación, Territorial Prelature of Encarnación

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 16 Feb 2019

Quantcast