Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Bianconi

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1852Born
15 Nov 187422.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189744.9AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
25 Apr 189744.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
12 Jun 192270.0DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bianconi (VIAF: 88780360)
Bishop Domenico Bianconi (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiperno
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,923
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,897, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast