Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Basbous

Deceased

Bishop of Sadā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1846Born
18 Feb 190053.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sadā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Sep 190054.5ConfirmedBishop of Sadā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon
7 Sep 191872.5DiedBishop of Sadā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Paul Basbous
Bishop Paul Basbous (born , died ) Bishop of Sadā (Sidone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerapta

  • a bishop for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast