Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Debs

Deceased

Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1833Born
11 Feb 187238.3AppointedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
11 Feb 187238.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
4 Oct 190773.9DiedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Debs (VIAF: 88823518)
Archbishop Joseph Debs (born , died ) Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaschiva

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Dec 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017