Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Estefan

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1847Born
24 Sep 189649.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti
24 Sep 189649.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti
4 Jul 191567.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Joseph Estefan
Archbishop Joseph Estefan (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus per i Maroniti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJusta

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,402
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017