Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Bargiggia

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1876BornLacchiarella
9 Jun 190023.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 192750.3AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
24 Apr 192750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
6 Jul 193760.6AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
11 Apr 194669.4DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bargiggia:
Bishop Giovanni Bargiggia (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013