Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abdallah Bared

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Titular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1922BornGibasl
27 Jun 194825.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 198663.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
2 May 198663.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
12 Jul 198663.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Maroniti
15 Jul 198865.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Abdallah Bared:
Bishop Abdallah Bared (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013