Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elie Farah

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cipro (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1909Born
9 Apr 193525.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 195444.3AppointedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite)
26 Sep 195444.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite)
4 Apr 198676.2RetiredArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite)
22 Jul 200393.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cipro (Maronite)

MicroData Summary for Elie Farah
Archbishop Elie Farah (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cipro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKafar Berhem

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 48.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Aug 2021

Quantcast