Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Merhi, M.L. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1912BornMreijat
13 Jul 193624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Lebanese Maronite Missionaries (Maronite)
24 Aug 197260.6AppointedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
26 Aug 197260.6Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
5 Jun 198977.4RetiredBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt
30 Mar 200694.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo} (Maronite), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Joseph Merhi:
Bishop Joseph Merhi M.L. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Caire {Cairo}

  • a priest for 69.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013