Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maroun Khoury Sader

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1926Born
11 May 195225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
1 Jun 199265.4AppointedArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
18 Jul 199265.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Sep 200376.7RetiredArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
26 Aug 201588.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Maroun Khoury Sader
Archbishop Maroun Khoury Sader (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAin-Ebel

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,788
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,920
  • d: CB, 27 Aug 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018