Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Baquero, S.D.B.

Bishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1970 Born
1 Apr 199019.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Dec 199929.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Jan 201746.3AppointedBishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea
25 Mar 201746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kerema, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Pedro Baquero
Bishop Pedro Baquero S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Kerema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines
Ordained PriestSantuario Mariano di Manila, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Kerema, Diocese of Kerema

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kerema.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 30 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 20 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017