Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bacchini

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy

Titular Bishop of OŽa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1837Born
2 Jun 186023.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 189860.9AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
20 Mar 189860.9Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
11 Dec 190568.7ResignedBishop of Terni, Italy
11 Dec 190568.7AppointedTitular Bishop of OŽa
13 Jan 190870.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bacchini
Bishop Francesco Bacchini (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giovanni in Marignano
Ordained BishopVilla Lante, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 321
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,406
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1898, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018