Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bosco Auram

Bishop of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1972 Born
17 Jan 200431.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea
18 Oct 201946.9AppointedBishop of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea
25 Jan 202047.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for John Bosco Auram
Bishop John Bosco Auram (born ) Bishop of Kimbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKandoka, Provincia di West New Britain, Archdiocese of Rabaul
Ordained BishopBernard Vogae Memorial Park, Kimbe, Diocese of Kimbe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kimbe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2019
  • ob: CB, 29 Dec 2019
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast