Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Assi

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1919Born
29 May 194323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Dec 197556.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Dec 197556.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Frequentium
6 Jan 197656.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Frequentium
26 May 198363.8AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
19 Jun 198363.9InstalledBishop of Cremona, Italy
16 Sep 199273.1DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Assi (VIAF: 38395374)
Bishop Enrico Assi (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVimercate
Ordained BishopSan Nicolò, Basilica, Lecco, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Cremona, Diocese of Cremona

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017