Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Ashta, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pult, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1918Born
2 Jul 194223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Dec 199274.3AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
25 Apr 199374.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
12 Apr 199879.6DiedBishop of Pult, Albania

MicroData Summary for Robert Ashta
Bishop Robert Ashta O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Pult

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodėr

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,069
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018