Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jude Ayodeji Arogundade

Bishop of Ondo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1961 BornOka-Akoko
8 Sep 199029.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ondo, Nigeria
15 Feb 201048.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ondo, Nigeria
6 May 201048.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ondo, Nigeria
26 Nov 201049.5SucceededBishop of Ondo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Jude Ayodeji Arogundade:
Bishop Jude Ayodeji Arogundade (born ) Bishop of Ondo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ondo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ~s: Bollettino, 6 May 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,641

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013