Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Arnáiz Zarandona, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

Titular Bishop of Leges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1925BornBilbao, Spain
30 May 194116.2ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
15 Jul 195530.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Dec 198863.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
2 Dec 198863.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Leges
6 Jan 198963.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leges
31 Jul 200277.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
14 Feb 201488.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Arnáiz Zarandona:
Bishop Francisco José Arnáiz Zarandona S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,029
  • d: CB, 14 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 15 Feb 2014