Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Darwin Rudy Andino Ramírez, C.R.S.

Bishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1959 Born
29 Apr 198828.7Solemn VowsMember of Clerks Regular of Somasca
8 Dec 199031.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
1 Apr 200646.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
1 Apr 200646.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Horta
24 Jun 200646.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horta
7 Nov 201152.2AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Darwin Rudy Andino Ramírez
Bishop Darwin Rudy Andino Ramírez C.R.S. (born ) Bishop of Santa Rosa de Copán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTegucigalpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Rosa de Copán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,172
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast