Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Amoroso, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trapani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1927BornMessina
29 Jun 195426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Sep 198153.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
2 Sep 198153.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
24 Oct 198154.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
8 Sep 198861.0AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
18 Aug 199769.9DiedBishop of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Amoroso:
Bishop Domenico Amoroso S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Trapani

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013