Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís António de Almeida

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda

Titular Bishop of Arena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1872BornCavalões
20 Dec 189422.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 193260.2AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
8 Dec 193260.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
4 Oct 193563.2ResignedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
4 Oct 193563.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arena
19 Apr 194168.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Luís António de Almeida:
Bishop Luís António de Almeida (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança e Miranda

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013