Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Alfano

Archbishop of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1956 BornNocera Inferiore
17 Apr 198225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy
14 May 200548.9AppointedArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
2 Jul 200549.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia, Italy
10 Mar 201255.7AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alfano:
Archbishop Francesco Alfano (born ) Archbishop of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sorrento-Castellammare di Stabia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013